Foxx v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Reginald Foxx
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2008cv00403
Filed: July 10, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 20 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Reginald Foxx, recommending that the motion be granted and that Plaintiff receive attorney's fee in the amount of $673.68 under EAJA. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/2/09. (cmj)
November 17, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 20 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Reginald Foxx, recommending that the motion be granted and that Plaintiff receive attorney's fee in the amount of $673.68 under EAJA. Objections to R&R due by 12/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/17/09. (cmj)
September 3, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT reversing and remanding decision of Commissioner of SS. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/3/09. (cmj)
August 27, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Reginald Foxx, recommending that the decision of the Commissioner be reversed and remanded. Objections to R&R due by 9/11/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/26/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foxx v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Foxx
Represented By: Colin Edward Kemmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?