Shaw v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Sharon J. Shaw
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2008cv00404
Filed: July 10, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Plf is awarded reasonable attny's fees in the amount of $1,348.80 under EAJA & court costs of $350.00 w/a total EAJA award due & owing Plf in amount of $1,698.80 as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/22/09. (tot) Modified on 7/22/2009 (tot).
June 15, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: 22 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Sharon J. Shaw. It is recommended that Plf be awarded an attny's fees in the amount of $1,348.80 under the EAJA as set out & court costs of $350.00 for a total EAJA award in this case of $1,698.80. Objections to R&R due by 6/29/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/15/09. (tot)
March 27, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security partially denying Plf benefits be reversed & remanded as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/27/09. (srr)
March 12, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security partially denying Plf benefits be reversed & remanded as set out. Objections to R&R due by 3/26/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/12/09. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon J. Shaw
Represented By: Colin Edward Kemmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?