Walker v. Biogistics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David Walker
Defendant: Biogistics, Inc. and Kambiz Pourrezaei
Case Number: 1:2008cv00530
Filed: September 17, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2010 99 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING 97 MOTION for Scott Hetrick to Withdraw as Attorney. Dft is granted leave until 2/4/2010 to retain new counsel as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/21/10. (copy mailed to Biogistics, Inc. @ address in Doc. 97 on 1/21/10) (tot)
January 14, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting plaintiff's 84 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/14/2010. (sdb)
March 24, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as set out. Dfts' 2 MOTION to Dismiss is DENIED as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/24/09. (tot)
January 14, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Dfts' 2 MOTION to Dismiss be denied as set out. Objections to R&R due by 1/29/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 1/14/09. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Biogistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Walker
Represented By: Richard Edwin Lamberth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biogistics, Inc.
Represented By: Norman J. Gale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kambiz Pourrezaei
Represented By: Norman J. Gale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?