Hogge v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Tara A. Hogge
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2009cv00018
Filed: January 9, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION entered re 21 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA) filed by Tara A. Hogge recommending that pltf's counsel be awarded $3,434.00 in attorney's fees under the EAJA and court costs of $350.00 for a total EAJA award of $3,784.00. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/8/2010. (cmj)
December 23, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION entered re 21 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA) filed by Tara A. Hogge recommending that pltf's counsel be awarded $3,434.00 in attorney's fees under the EAJA and court costs of $350.00 for a total EAJA award of $3,784.00. Objections to R&R due by 1/6/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/18/09. (mca)
September 15, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered remanding this action to SSA for further proceedings.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/15/09. (cmj)
August 27, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 Unopposed MOTION to Remand Pursuant to Sentence Four filed by Michael J. Astrue recommending the motion be granted and this Court remand this action to the Commissioner. Objections to R&R due by 9/11/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/27/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogge v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara A. Hogge
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?