Hall v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Sheryle W. Hall
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2009cv00031
Filed: January 20, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Butler
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion for Attorney Fees (EAJA); adopting Report and Recommendations: After due and proper consideration of all portions of this file deemed relevant to the issues raised,the motion for fees is GRANTED. The defendant is ordered to pay plaintiff's counsel the sum of $3,811.96. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 3/4/10. (adk)
February 10, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 25 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA) filed by Sheryle W. Hall Objections to R&R due by 2/24/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/10/10. (adk)
October 20, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, filed by Sheryle W. Hall. The order of the Commissioner denying benefits is VACATED, and this action is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further proceedings in conformity with the orders of the court. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 10/20/09. (adk)
October 6, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, filed by Sheryle W. Hall Objections to R&R due by 10/21/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/6/09. (adk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryle W. Hall
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?