Yates v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Yates
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2009cv00212
Filed: April 16, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that plaintiff's counsel, Colin Edward Kemmerly, is hereby awarded attorneys fees in the amount of $1,028.54 pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA), 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d)(1), as compensation for 6.00 hours of legal services rendered in this court. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 04/14/2010. (mab)
December 30, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security denying claimant benefits is REVERSED & REMANDED. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/30/09. (tot)
December 10, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security denying Plf's benefits be VACATED & REMANDED as set out. Objections to R&R due by 12/24/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/10/09. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Yates
Represented By: Colin Edward Kemmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?