Todd v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Robert E. Todd
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2009cv00318
Filed: June 5, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees, It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff's attorney, Byron A. Lassiter, be AWARDED a fee in the amount of $1,939.75 for his services before this Court; that Lassiter be allowed to RETAIN $3,548.39, the amount previously awarded under EAJA; that Lassiter pay Plaintiff $1,939.75, the sum representing the fee being awarded under § 406(b); and that Lassiter be AWARDED the amount of $350.00, representing the Court filing fee, pursuant to the previous Order and Judgment, entered on March 3, 2010 (Docs. 25-26). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 10/24/2011. (clr)
March 3, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff's Application for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act be and is hereby GRANTED and that Plaintiff's counsel, Byron A. Lassiter, be AWARDED an EAJA attorney's fee in the amount of $3,548.39 plus $350.00 in court costs for a total fee and expenses in the amount of $3,898.39. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 3/3/10. (clr)
March 1, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff's Application for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act be and is hereby GRANTED and that Plaintiffs counsel, Byron A. Lassiter, be AWARDED an EAJA attorney's fee in the amount of$3,548.39. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 3/1/10. (clr)
November 9, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff Robert E. Todd against Defendant Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 11/9/09. (clr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Todd
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?