Williams v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Andre T. Williams
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2010cv00611
Filed: November 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Presiding Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that JUDGMENT be entered in favor of Plaintiff Andre T. Williams and against Defendant Michael J. Astrue. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff be AWARDED an EAJA attorneys fee in the amount of $3,634.46. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 12/13/2011. (clr)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 JUDGMENT entered, It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that JUDGMENT be entered in favor of Plaintiff Andre T. Williams and against Defendant Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 7/28/2011. (clr)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff Andre T. Williams against Defendant Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 5/27/2011. (clr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre T. Williams
Represented By: Margaret A. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?