M.R. et al v. Board of School Commissioners of Mobile County et al

Plaintiff: S.A., J.C., E.M., M.R., K.S. and D.M.
Defendant: Board of School Commissioners of Mobile County, Jerome Woods, Kirven Lang and Jason D. Laffitte
Case Number: 1:2011cv00245
Filed: May 12, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2012 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 84 Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/29/2012. (tgw)
August 30, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 72 Motion Abstain and Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/2012. (tgw)
July 18, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 56 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiffs' claims against defendants Jerome Woods, Kirven Lang, and Jason D. Laffitte are dismissed without prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate those individuals as parties defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/18/2012. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.R. et al v. Board of School Commissioners of Mobile County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.A.
Represented By: Jadine Caroline Johnson
Represented By: Marion Dawn Chartoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.C.
Represented By: Jadine Caroline Johnson
Represented By: Marion Dawn Chartoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.M.
Represented By: Marion Dawn Chartoff
Represented By: Jadine Caroline Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.R.
Represented By: Jadine Caroline Johnson
Represented By: Marion Dawn Chartoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.S.
Represented By: Jadine Caroline Johnson
Represented By: Marion Dawn Chartoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.M.
Represented By: Jadine Caroline Johnson
Represented By: Marion Dawn Chartoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of School Commissioners of Mobile County
Represented By: James Derek Atchison
Represented By: Frank G. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Woods
Represented By: James Derek Atchison
Represented By: Frank G. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirven Lang
Represented By: James Derek Atchison
Represented By: Frank G. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason D. Laffitte
Represented By: James Derek Atchison
Represented By: Frank G. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?