Salter v. Booker et al

Plaintiff: Brenda Salter
Defendant: Edwin Booker, Tyrone Boykin, M. A. Mitchell, Steve Messer, Alisha Brown, Greg Harrelson, Donna Cobb, Melissa Trannum, Kelly Adams, Jennifer Wright, Shirley Trent, Monica Johnson and City of Evergreen, Alabama
Case Number: 1:2012cv00174
Filed: March 7, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Conecuh
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2016 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART Dfts' 167 Motion for Summary Judgment to the extent that summary judgment is granted in favor Dfts Boykin & Booker & DENIED as to Dfts Mitchell, Trent & Pate as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/29/2016. (tot)
November 9, 2015 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: parties' 150 Stipulation of Dismissal of Jennifer Wright. Plf's claims against said Dft are DISMISSED w/prejudice as set out. Each party to bear her own costs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/9/2015. (tot)
September 17, 2013 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 101 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of this Court. It is ORDERED that (1) the 92 MOTION to Dismiss against United States & Monica Johnson is GRANTED & all claims against the United States & Monica Johnson are DISMISSE D; (2) the 89 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Edwin Booker is GRANTED to the extent that plaintiff's state law claim for wrongful death is DISMISSED, but the motion is DENIED w/respect to all other claims; and (3) the 90 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jennifer Wright, Melissa Trannum, M. A. Mitchell, Greg Harrelson, Donna Cobb, Alisha Brown, Tyrone Boykin, Steve Messer, Shirley Trent is GRANTED to the extent that plaintiff's state law claim for wrongful death against Chief Deputy Boykin is DISMISSED, but that the motion is DENIED with respect to all other claims against Chief Deputy Boykin and all claims against M.A. Mitchell, Steve Messer, Alisha Brown, Greg Harrelson, Donna Cobb, Melissa Trannum, Shirley Trent & Jennifer Wright. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/17/2013. (mab)
September 4, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING 78 MOTION to Set Aside Default as set out. 77 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Monica Johnson is SET ASIDE. Plf is to serve summons & complaint on the United States on or before 10/4/2012 as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/4/2012. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salter v. Booker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Salter
Represented By: H. Wallace Blizzard
Represented By: Henry Brewster
Represented By: C. Michael Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Booker
Represented By: J. Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrone Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. A. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisha Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harrelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Trannum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Trent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Evergreen, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?