Polonczyk v. Colvin et al

Plaintiff: Kim Anthony Polonczyk
Defendant: United States Department of Social Security, Michael J. Astrue and Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 1:2014cv00327
Filed: July 14, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/12/2014. (tgw)
October 29, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/29/2014. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
October 16, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action be and is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/16/2014. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polonczyk v. Colvin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Anthony Polonczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?