Fidelity Bank v. Key Hotels of Brewton, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Fidelity Bank
Defendant: Key Hotels of Brewton, LLC and Anand Patel
Case Number: 1:2015cv00031
Filed: January 23, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 87 MOTION to Set Aside Conditional Judgment filed by Lucky Irish Pub of Saraland, LLC. The Conditional Judgment (doc. 85) entered against Garnishee on June 15, 2016 in the amount of $2,044,311.94 is hereby set aside and vaca ted. The parties are ordered by 7/29/2016 to file a joint notice as to whether Plaintiff's assertion that the Garnishee's answer is untrue might be resolved informally. If the attempt to resolve the issue fails, the parties are ordered by 8/5/2016 a joint proposal regarding how this matter should proceed. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/13/2016. (tgw)
January 5, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT: it is ordered, adjudged and decreed that DEFAULT JUDGMENT be, and the same hereby is, entered in favor of plaintiff Fidelity Bank and against defendants Key Hotels of Brewton, LLC and Anand Patel, jointly and severally, in the amount of $2,044,311.94. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/5/2016. Copy mailed to Defendants. (tgw)
November 16, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court Order: The Court imposes sanctions of default against defendants, Key Hotels of Brewton, LLC and Anand Patel. Plaintiff is ordered by 12/7/2015 to file a memorandum regarding damages. Defendants' response is due by 12/21/2015. The 48 MOTION of Fidelity Bank to Establish Sale Procedures, as amended (Doc. 52 ) is granted as set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/16/2015. Copy mailed to defendants. (tgw)
October 27, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Defendants are ordered, on or before 11/9/15, to show cause why default judgment should not be entered against them for their willful noncompliance with the September 17 Order. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/26/15. Copies mailed to Key Hotels of Brewton, LLC and Anand Patel. (mbp)
September 17, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 46 MOTION for Lawrence B. Voit and Alexandra K. Garrett to Withdraw as Attorney. Anand Patel is ordered by 10/8/2015 to inform the Court if he intends to retain counsel or proceed pro se. Key Hotels is ordered by 10/8/2015 to inform the Court of the name, address and telephone number of the substitute counsel. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/17/2015. Copies mailed to defendants at the address set out. (tgw)
May 18, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 13 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Fidelity Bank will be held in abeyance until 6/17/15. Defendants are to file another status report by 6/17/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/18/15. (mbp)
April 13, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 13 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Fidelity Bank will be held in abeyance pending a status report from defendants which must be filed by 5/11/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/13/2015. (mbp)
February 2, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion to Appoint Receiver, with leave to renew motion upon proper notice to defendants. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/2/2015. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidelity Bank v. Key Hotels of Brewton, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity Bank
Represented By: Eric J. Breithaupt(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Richard M. Gaal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Hotels of Brewton, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anand Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?