Adams et al v. International Paper Company et al

Plaintiff: Adams, David K. Dock, Mary Roberson, Hakim Yisrayl, David Sullivan, Willie N. Jones, Jr., Constance P. Agee, James Smith, Johnnietta Dozier, Kanetria Barnes, John Seth Tunstall, Mary Smith, Mary Edwards, Ernest L. Williams, Darlyna Hill, Leander Overton, Irene U. Daniels, Sharon E. Harris, Floretta Thomas, Evelyn Hall, Ingrid Welch, Temutis Purifoy, Darrel Lynch, Jr., Kembrick L. Campbell, Deborah Giles, Kermic F. Maiben, Tory Henderson, Antoinette B. Singleton, Madeline Hannah James, Ebony McCovery, Arthur Ruggs, Gregory L. Smith, Miguel Grimes, Vanassa Hayes, Landra Johnson, Brenda McCovery, Wazetta Campbell, Leon Hampton, Vernisha Hall, Caroleshia White, Mindi Smith, Christopher L. Williams, Sr., Robert D. Agee, Kenneth L. Wright, Candice Walker, Willis Pollard, Novelyn Jones, John Stephens, Venessa H. Pettway, Flora Prince, Gilbert Leggett, Jerry Barnett, Yaquanda McBride, Barbara Evans, Larcay T. McCovery, Winifred H. Ellis, Carolyn M. Stephens, Roy P. Hamilton, Sr., Maro Parker, Charlie C. Christy, Patricia Timmons, Tavonta Autrey, Irma Jean Purifoy, Jeremy Maiben, Cindy Rox, Mary G. Jones, Tamichael Maiben, Grady Hamilton, Williard S. Jones, Gwendolyn July, Linda G. Lee, Herbert O. Parker, Patricia Dock, Willie Mae Jones, Kerry McCovery, Samuel Adams, Thelma C. Coleman, Derrick Timmons, Loraine Burpo, Roy P. Hamilton, Jr., Patricia Hamilton, James C. Maiben, Katrina Miller, Lawrence Byard, Beverly Holcomb, Santanna McBride, Philip A. Tucker, Walter Moorer, Eleanor Jones, Gail M. Stephen, Robert Moore, Myrtle J. Johnson, Karen Henderson, Mary D. Reed, Claudette Henderson, Darius Jones, Justina Hall, Lebaun Barner, Mary Powell, Ora Moorer, Felice Michael Harris, Johnnie Campbell, Tracey Michael Packer, Leroy Pettway, Delores Clark, John Ragler, Michael Gamble, Miguel Wright, Darrius Anderson, Dierdre Jones, Bettye Greene, Charles B. Walker, Christopher Whitley, Darice H. Timmons, Labarron Marks, Barbara Davis, Jolanda Keeby, Raylon Barnes, Rochelle Edwards, Glenn Miller, Juanita Miskell, Verdella Harris, Charlie Robinson, Angelicia Leggett, Jerry Russell, Jennifer Miskell, Johnquaye Campbell, Amino M. Marks, Rayford Barnes, Gloria Hunter, Betty Maiben, Bessie C. Henderson, Joseph Nathan Sellers, Sarah Jackson, Robert L. Moore, Jr., Tommy Lee Brown, Phyllis Dinkins, Ernest Harris, Isaiah Winbush, Methel Burrell, Clara P. Randall, Cynthia Portis Likely, Johnnie McCovery, Shannon Barnes, Constance Parker, Jacqueline Parker, Thelma Maiben-Owens, Kelvin D. Jones, Jamar James, Shamichael Maiben, Alexander Harris, James W. Harris, Ora Williams, Shirley Campbell, Darlesia Barnett, Willie J. Jones, Jr., Larshay McCovery, Carla Gage, Cartezs Powell, Hazel Russell, Taneika Payne-Marks, Eddie L. Pickett, Annie Knight, Perry L. Moore, Ronald Weider, Tywanna Campbell, Stanley Jefferson, Madelyn Dunklin, Lucy Thomas, Allen Keith Rigsby, Ishemia Etheridge, Cherlyn Harris, Michael Lambert, Ruth T. Ballard, Brenda D. Tucker, Irma Lee Cunningham, Rosa Scott, Herbert F. Brown, Anthony Harris, Sandra B. Cunningham, Nellie McCovery, Ronald C. Winslow, Bobby Walker, Edward Harris, Nashasta L. Pollard, Lillie Franklin, Willie Hill, Minnie Mosley, Linda B. Coleman, Delores Campbell, Michael McClinton, Deborah P. Knight, William Timmons, Terrika Coelman, Shemeka Watson, Melanie Portis-Smith, John Davis, Angela Powell-Harrison, Anthony Brown, Antoinette Barnett, Geneva Dinkins, Donna C. Austin, Wayne Robinson, Pinkie Mitchell, Demetrius Crawford, Jacques Hill, Jeffrey Bell, Annie E. McCovery, Demond S. Baldwin, Carol Pickett, Wendell Boykin, Donna Smith, Sharon Davis, Jamichael Rox, Ida Maiben, Tammy Barnes, Reginald Franklin, Sr., Brenda S. Williams, Velma Harris, Lester Portis, Tamichael Grimes, Rhonda Burroughs, Michael Powell, William Ellis, Edward Eaton, Douglas July, Juanita B. Michael, Jacqueline M. Henley, Carolyn Powell, Clyde Hall, William Richardson, Kemichelle Taylor, Washington T. Taylor, Manuel D. Fagan, Donovan Patterson and Theresa Gilchrist
Defendant: International Paper Company, H.O. Weaver & Sons, Inc. and Bay Area Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00105
Filed: March 6, 2017
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge: Sonja F Bivins
1 Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2017 28 ***Remand Confirmation. Case received and reinstated in Mobile County Circuit Court. (tgw)
May 5, 2017 27 Remand Letter, Certified Docket Sheet and Order sent via email to Circuit Court of Mobile County re #26 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court. (tgw)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order 26 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Remand to Circuit Court of Mobile County. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 5/5/2017. (tgw)
May 5, 2017 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenyen Ray Brown on behalf of International Paper Company (Brown, Kenyen)
May 5, 2017 MOTIONS REFERRED: #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to H.O. Weaver & Sons, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss to Judge Steele (tgw)
May 4, 2017 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to H.O. Weaver & Sons, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Edward)
May 4, 2017 23 MOTION for Steven J. Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2060653, Online Credit Card Payment.) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing) (Baker, Steven)
May 1, 2017 MOTIONS REFERRED: #22 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Affidavit in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Referred to Judge William H. Steele. (srd)
May 1, 2017 22 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Affidavit in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Redditt, F.)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order 21 Order re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by H.O. Weaver & Sons, Inc. Responses due by 5/8/2017, Replies due by 5/15/2017. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/25/2017. Copy mailed to attorneys Lonnie Washington, Steven Baker & W. Taylor Stewart. (tgw)
April 25, 2017 MOTIONS REFERRED: #20 MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Steele (tgw)
April 24, 2017 20 MOTION to Dismiss by H.O. Weaver & Sons, Inc.. (Luther, Jeffrey)
April 24, 2017 REFERRAL OF #19 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge Steele. (tgw)
April 21, 2017 19 REPLY to Response to Motion #11 to Remand filed by all Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Johnson, Edward)
April 13, 2017 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Response to Judge Steele (tgw)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 18 Order granting #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to the #11 Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs. Reply due by 4/21/2017. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/12/2017. (tgw)
April 12, 2017 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Response by All Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Edward)
April 6, 2017 REFERRAL OF #16 Response to Judge Steele. (tgw)
April 6, 2017 16 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #6 Amended Complaint and Motion to Dismiss filed by International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Redditt, F.) Modified on 4/6/2017 (tgw).
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order 15 Order re: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiffs. Responses due by 4/7/2017, Replies due by 4/14/2017. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 3/24/2017. Copy mailed to attorneys Lonnie Washington, Steven Baker & W. Taylor Stewart. (tgw)
March 24, 2017 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court to Judge Steele (tgw)
March 24, 2017 14 Attorney Admission and ECF Registration Letter mailed to W. Taylor Stewart, Steven J. Baker, Lonnie A. Washington, Sr; Attorneys to comply within 7 days. (tgw)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order 13 Order re: #7 Objection to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Request for Additional Time to Respond filed by International Paper Company. Answer due from International Paper Company on 4/6/2017. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 3/24/2017. Copy mailed to attorneys Lonnie Washington, Steven Baker & W. Taylor Stewart. (tgw)
March 24, 2017 12 Memorandum in Support of #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Edward McF. Johnson, #2 Exhibit Bell Carr v. Arvin Industries) (Johnson, Edward) Modified on 3/24/2017 (tgw).
March 24, 2017 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Edward)
March 24, 2017 10 Summons Issued as to H.O. Weaver & Sons, Inc. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tgw)
March 24, 2017 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by All Plaintiffs to H.O. Weaver & Sons, Inc. (Johnson, Edward)
March 17, 2017 8 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge William H. Steele and Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (mpp)
March 16, 2017 7 Objection re: #6 Amended Complaint, #5 Notice (Other) and Request for Additional Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. (Redditt, F.)
March 15, 2017 REFERRAL OF #6 Amended Complaint, #5 Notice (Other), #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal to Judge Bivins. (mpp)
March 14, 2017 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint against All Plaintiffs, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Edward)
March 14, 2017 5 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Amended Complaint (Johnson, Edward)
March 14, 2017 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by all Plaintiffs as to Bay Area Contracting, Inc. (Johnson, Edward) Modified docket text on 3/15/2017 (mpp).
March 13, 2017 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant International Paper Company. (Redditt, F.)
March 6, 2017 2 ANSWER to Complaint by International Paper Company. (Redditt, F.)
March 6, 2017 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by International Paper Company from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number 02-CV-2017-900408.00. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number 1128-2031828, Online Credit Card Payment.), filed by International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of John Meacham) (Redditt, F.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2017: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (mpp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. International Paper Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Christopher James Williams
Represented By: John A. Smyth, III
Represented By: Herman Finhold Cox, Jr.
Represented By: F. Grey Redditt, Jr.
Represented By: Kenyen Ray Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.O. Weaver & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Luther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David K. Dock
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roberson
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hakim Yisrayl
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sullivan
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie N. Jones, Jr.
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance P. Agee
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Smith
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnietta Dozier
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kanetria Barnes
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Seth Tunstall
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Smith
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Edwards
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest L. Williams
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlyna Hill
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leander Overton
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene U. Daniels
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon E. Harris
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floretta Thomas
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Hall
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Welch
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Temutis Purifoy
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrel Lynch, Jr.
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kembrick L. Campbell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Giles
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kermic F. Maiben
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tory Henderson
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette B. Singleton
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline Hannah James
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony McCovery
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Ruggs
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory L. Smith
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Grimes
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanassa Hayes
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landra Johnson
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda McCovery
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wazetta Campbell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Hampton
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernisha Hall
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroleshia White
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mindi Smith
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Williams, Sr.
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Agee
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L. Wright
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Walker
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Pollard
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novelyn Jones
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stephens
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venessa H. Pettway
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora Prince
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Leggett
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Barnett
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaquanda McBride
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Evans
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larcay T. McCovery
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winifred H. Ellis
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn M. Stephens
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy P. Hamilton, Sr.
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maro Parker
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie C. Christy
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Timmons
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tavonta Autrey
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Jean Purifoy
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Maiben
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Rox
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary G. Jones
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamichael Maiben
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grady Hamilton
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williard S. Jones
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn July
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda G. Lee
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert O. Parker
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Dock
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Mae Jones
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry McCovery
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Adams
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma C. Coleman
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Timmons
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loraine Burpo
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy P. Hamilton, Jr.
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Hamilton
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Maiben
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Miller
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Byard
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Holcomb
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santanna McBride
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip A. Tucker
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Moorer
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Jones
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail M. Stephen
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Moore
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtle J. Johnson
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Henderson
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary D. Reed
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudette Henderson
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darius Jones
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justina Hall
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lebaun Barner
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Powell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ora Moorer
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felice Michael Harris
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Campbell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Michael Packer
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Pettway
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Clark
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ragler
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gamble
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Wright
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrius Anderson
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dierdre Jones
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bettye Greene
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles B. Walker
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Whitley
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darice H. Timmons
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Labarron Marks
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Davis
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolanda Keeby
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raylon Barnes
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Edwards
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Miller
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Miskell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verdella Harris
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Robinson
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelicia Leggett
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Russell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Miskell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnquaye Campbell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amino M. Marks
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayford Barnes
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Hunter
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Maiben
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie C. Henderson
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Nathan Sellers
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Jackson
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Moore, Jr.
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Lee Brown
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Dinkins
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Harris
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Winbush
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Methel Burrell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara P. Randall
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Portis Likely
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie McCovery
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Barnes
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Parker
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Parker
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Maiben-Owens
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin D. Jones
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamar James
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamichael Maiben
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Harris
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Harris
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ora Williams
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Campbell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlesia Barnett
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie J. Jones, Jr.
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larshay McCovery
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Gage
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cartezs Powell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel Russell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taneika Payne-Marks
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie L. Pickett
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Knight
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry L. Moore
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Weider
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tywanna Campbell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Jefferson
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madelyn Dunklin
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Thomas
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Keith Rigsby
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ishemia Etheridge
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherlyn Harris
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lambert
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth T. Ballard
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda D. Tucker
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Lee Cunningham
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Scott
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert F. Brown
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Harris
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra B. Cunningham
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nellie McCovery
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald C. Winslow
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Walker
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Harris
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nashasta L. Pollard
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Franklin
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Hill
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnie Mosley
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda B. Coleman
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Campbell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McClinton
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah P. Knight
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Timmons
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrika Coelman
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shemeka Watson
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Portis-Smith
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Davis
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Powell-Harrison
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Brown
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Barnett
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva Dinkins
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna C. Austin
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Robinson
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinkie Mitchell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Crawford
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacques Hill
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Bell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie E. McCovery
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demond S. Baldwin
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Pickett
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Boykin
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Smith
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Davis
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamichael Rox
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida Maiben
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Barnes
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Franklin, Sr.
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda S. Williams
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velma Harris
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Portis
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamichael Grimes
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Burroughs
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Powell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ellis
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Eaton
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas July
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita B. Michael
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline M. Henley
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Powell
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Hall
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Richardson
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kemichelle Taylor
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington T. Taylor
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel D. Fagan
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donovan Patterson
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Gilchrist
Represented By: William Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Edward McFarland Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Baker
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Represented By: Lonnie Anthony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?