Riggs v. Brooks et al

Plaintiff: Jessie Riggs
Defendant: Ben H. Brooks, Patrick Doggett, Bryan Smith, Dennis Owens and JoJo Schwarzauer
Case Number: 1:2017cv00469
Filed: October 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Presiding Judge: P. Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice for failure to prosecute as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 04/19/2019. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff.
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER, 18 Report and Recommendation; OVERRULING Plaintiff's 19 Objections; DENYING 15 Motion to Amend 28:2254 Writ of Habeas Corpus; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 21 Motion to Amend; and permitting Plaintiff to file, no later th an 4/12/2019, (1) an amended complaint under 42:1983; (2) a habeas petition pursuant to 28:2254; or (3) separately, an amended Section 1983 complaint and a Section 2254 habeas petition as set out in Order. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 03/08/2019. (copy to Pltf with copies of form 1983 complaint and 2254 habeas petition & 14 Order) (mab)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER UNREFERRING AND DENYING 3 Motion to Dismiss as set out herein. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 09/14/2018. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff.
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING 10 Report and Recommendation as the opinion of this Court, and DENYING 6 Motion to Remand. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 08/09/2018. (copy to Pltf) (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riggs v. Brooks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben H. Brooks
Represented By: Mary A. Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Doggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Smith
Represented By: Kasee Sparks Heisterhagen
Represented By: Lewis Robert Shreve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Owens
Represented By: Kasee Sparks Heisterhagen
Represented By: Lewis Robert Shreve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoJo Schwarzauer
Represented By: Mary A. Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?