Hancock Whitney Bank v. Dumas Realty, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hancock Whitney Bank
Defendant: William E. Dumas, Jr. and Dumas Realty, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00187
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 REFERRAL OF #10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to all Defendants to Judge Granade. (tot)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to all Defendants by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Mahoney, Philip)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to William E. Dumas, Jr., Dumas Realty, Inc. (copies mailed to Dfts on 6/17/19) (tot)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against All Defendants . (Mahoney, Philip)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to all Defendants by Hancock Whitney Bank. All Defendants (Mahoney, Philip)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants by Hancock Whitney Bank. All Defendants (Mahoney, Philip)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summonses Reissued as to William E. Dumas, Jr, & Dumas Realty, Inc. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been re-issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Hancock Whitney Bank (Mahoney, Philip)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Service Notice issued 4/12/2019. Plaintiff's notice of service attempt due 5/28/2019 pursuant to Civil L.R. 4(3). (mab)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to William E. Dumas, Jr, Dumas Realty, Inc. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William E. Dumas, Jr, Dumas Realty, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2382998, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Mahoney, Philip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2019: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (srd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock Whitney Bank v. Dumas Realty, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E. Dumas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dumas Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hancock Whitney Bank
Represented By: Philip Daniel Mahoney
Represented By: Jeffery J. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?