Hancock Whitney Bank v. Mason et al
Plaintiff: Hancock Whitney Bank
Defendant: Charlie Health Mason, Toni Scott Mason, Charlie Heath Mason, 7 General Contracting, Inc., Toni Scott Mason doing business as 7 General Contracting, Inc. and Charlie Heath Mason doing business as 7 General Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00010
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order re: #35 Status Report filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. Parties are ORDERED to file on or before 8/16/2021, a Joint Status Report to inform the Court as to the status of the bankruptcy action as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/07/2021. (srd)
May 6, 2021 Filing 35 STATUS REPORT - Joint Status Report by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Hartley, Jeffery)
May 6, 2021 REFERRAL OF #35 Status Report to Judge DuBose. (srd)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order DIRECTING parties to file a Joint Status Report on or before 5/14/2021 as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 04/30/2021. (srd)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order DIRECTING parties to file a Joint Status Report on or before 4/19/2021 as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 01/19/2021. (srd)
January 13, 2021 Filing 32 STATUS REPORT by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Mahoney, Philip)
January 13, 2021 REFERRAL OF #32 Status Report to Judge DuBose. (srd)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order re: #30 Status Report filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. Parties are DIRECTED to file a Joint Status Report on or before 1/13/2021 that complies with this Court's Order as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/29/2020. (srd)
December 3, 2020 Filing 30 STATUS REPORT by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Mahoney, Philip)
December 3, 2020 REFERRAL OF #30 Status Report to Judge DuBose. (srd)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order DIRECTING parties to file a Joint Status Report on or before 12/11/2020 as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/24/2020. (srd)
November 23, 2020 REFERRAL OF #28 Suggestion of Bankruptcy to Judge DuBose. (srd)
November 20, 2020 Filing 28 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Mahoney, Philip)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order re: #26 Notice of Appearance and Suggestion of Bankruptcy. This action is STAYED as to Toni Scott Mason and Charlie Heath Mason. Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/19/2020. (tgw)
August 12, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance and Suggestion of Bankruptcy by Alexandra Katsimpalis Garrett on behalf of Charlie Heath Mason, Toni Scott Mason (Garrett, Alexandra) Modified on 8/12/2020 (srd).
August 12, 2020 REFERRAL OF #26 Notice of Appearance and Suggestion of Bankruptcy to Judge DuBose. (srd)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Charging Order. Charging Order entered, as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/28/2020. (tgw)
June 25, 2020 Filing 24 Motion for Charging Order filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Mahoney, Philip)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order re: #7 Suggestion of Bankruptcy filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. Plaintiff is ORDERED to notify the Court in writing within seven (7) calendar days of either the issuance of relief from the automatic stay or the dismissal or other cessation of the bankruptcy proceedings. To keep the Court apprised as to the bankruptcy proceedings, the Plaintiff is further ORDERED to file a written report reflecting the status of his bankruptcy case every 90 days, with the first such report due on October 1, 2020. (Status Report due by 10/1/2020.). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/25/2020. (eec)
June 25, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #24 Motion for Charging Order to Judge DuBose (tgw)
June 23, 2020 Filing 22 JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Hancock Whitney Bank and against Defendants Charlie Heath Mason and Toni Scott Mason, jointly and severally, as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 06/23/2020. (Copy mailed to Charles Mason and Toni Mason at address provided in doc. 16) (nah) (Main Document 22 replaced on 6/23/2020) (nah).
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING #20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as the opinion of this Court, with modifications as set out in Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 06/23/2020. (Copy mailed to Charles Mason and Toni Mason at address provided in doc. 16) (nah)
June 17, 2020 REFERRAL OF #20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Judge DuBose. (nah)
May 26, 2020 Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment and #16 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants, Charlie Heath Mason and Toni Scott Mason filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. It is recommended Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, as amended, be GRANTED as to Count One for general damages, pre-judgment interest, post-judgment interest, and attorneys' fees and expenses. A default judgment should be ENTERED in favor of Plaintiff Hancock Whitney Bank and against Defendants Charles Heath Mason and Toni Scott Mason as set out. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 05/26/2020. (Copy mailed to Charles Mason and Toni Mason at address provided in doc. 16) (nah)
May 22, 2020 Filing 19 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. Review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to S.D. Ala. Civ. L.R. 7.1 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
May 22, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants, Charlie Heath Mason and Toni Scott Mason, REFERRAL OF #17 Affidavit to Judge DuBose. (nah)
May 21, 2020 Filing 18 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady and is now assigned to the docket of Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose and. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-C after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
April 17, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT re #16 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants, Charlie Heath Mason and Toni Scott Mason by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hartley, Jeffery)
April 16, 2020 Filing 16 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants, Charlie Heath Mason and Toni Scott Mason filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Mahoney, Philip)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order re: #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Charlie Heath Mason and Toni Scott Mason filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. Plaintiff is ordered, on or before May 15, 2020, to file an amended motion for entry of default judgment that supplements its evidentiary showing of damages with appropriate backup documentation establishing how the amounts due and owing under the promissory notes and guarantees were calculated. ( Amended Motions due by 5/15/2020.). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/15/2020. (eec)
March 27, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT re #13 Order,, Set Deadlines, by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Mahoney, Philip)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order re: #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Charlie Heath Mason and Toni Scott Mason filed by Hancock Whitney Bank, ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 4/9/2020.). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/26/2020. (eec)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement #11 Motion for Default Judgment. No later than March 4, 2020, Plaintiff is to advise the undersigned as to whether or not a hearing is required before entry of judgment and if an independent assessment by outside counsel as to the reasonableness of attorneys fees is necessary. Plaintiff shall also email to william_cassady@alsd.uscourts.gov a proposed Memorandum Opinion and Order and Judgment that are considered appropriate in this case. These documents are to be in Word format and contain sufficient findings of facts and conclusions of law that will be necessary to survive an appeal of the proposed decision. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/19/20. (Cassady, William)
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Charlie Heath Mason and Toni Scott Mason filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Affidavit) (Hartley, Jeffery)
February 6, 2020 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Charlie Heath Mason, Toni Scott Mason (eec)
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against Charlie Heath Mason, Toni Scott Mason . (Hartley, Jeffery)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order re: #7 Suggestion of Bankruptcy filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. This action against 7 General Contracting, Inc., is STAYED pending further order of the Court. The claims against Defendants Charles Heath Mason and Toni Scott Mason are not stayed by this Order and shall proceed. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/2/2020. (eec)
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to 7 General Contracting, Inc. - Suggestion of Bankruptcy and Limited Motion to Stay Proceedings by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Hartley, Jeffery)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hancock Whitney Bank. All Defendants (Mahoney, Philip)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement,,,,,,, #4 filed by Hancock Whitney Bank (Cassady, William)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Hancock Whitney Bank, Hancock Whitney Corporation, Hancock Bank Securities Corporation II, Avoca Incorporated, Berwick, LLC, Hancock Insurance Agency, HMC, LLC, Whitney Coon Bayou Investor, LLC, Hancock Whitney Equipment Finance, LLC, Hancock Whitney Finance and Leasing, LLC, Whitney New Markets Investor, LLC, Hancock New Markets Investor, LLC (Various), Hancock Whitney New Markets Investor, LLC, Hancock Whitney New Markets Fund, LLC, Hancock Whitney New Markets CDE, LLC, AL-FS, LLC, FS Properties of LA, LLC, HBLA Properties, LLC, HBRE Management, LLC, LA-FS Properties, LLC, MS-FS, LLC, MS-SA, LLC, Properties of TX-FS, LLC, SA-FL, LLC, SA-FL Legacy, LLC, TSPFL Holding, LLC, Terre Aux Boeufs Land Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hancock Whitney Corporation, Other Affiliate Avoca Incorporated, Other Affiliate Hancock Bank Securities Corporation II, Other Affiliate Berwick, LLC, Other Affiliate Hancock Insurance Agency, Other Affiliate HMC, LLC, Other Affiliate Whitney Coon Bayou Investor, LLC, Other Affiliate Hancock Whitney Equipment Finance, LLC, Other Affiliate Hancock Whitney Finance and Leasing, LLC, Other Affiliate Whitney New Markets Investor, LLC, Other Affiliate Hancock New Markets Investor, LLC (Various), Other Affiliate Hancock Whitney New Markets Investor, LLC, Other Affiliate Hancock Whitney New Markets Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate Hancock Whitney New Markets CDE, LLC, Other Affiliate AL-FS, LLC, Other Affiliate FS Properties of LA, LLC, Other Affiliate HBLA Properties, LLC, Other Affiliate HBRE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate LA-FS Properties, LLC, Other Affiliate MS-FS, LLC, Other Affiliate MS-SA, LLC, Other Affiliate Properties of TX-FS, LLC, Other Affiliate SA-FL, LLC, Other Affiliate SA-FL Legacy, LLC, Other Affiliate TSPFL Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate Terre Aux Boeufs Land Co., Inc. for Hancock Whitney Bank.. (Mahoney, Philip)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 7 General Contracting, Inc., Charlie Heath Mason, Toni Scott Mason. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hancock Whitney Bank ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2544284, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Mahoney, Philip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2020: #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (eec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock Whitney Bank v. Mason et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Health Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni Scott Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Heath Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7 General Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni Scott Mason doing business as 7 General Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Heath Mason doing business as 7 General Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hancock Whitney Bank
Represented By: Philip Daniel Mahoney
Represented By: Jeffery J. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?