Hancock Whitney Bank v. RAP, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Hancock Whitney Bank
Defendant: Dina G. Bender, RAP, L.L.C., David R. Barnett, Charles O. Hon, IV, Mary B. Barnett, Sarah B. Hon and Thomas B. Bender, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00254
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
2 Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/10/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/26/20. (cmj)
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #9 filed by Charles O. Hon, IV, RAP, L.L.C., David R. Barnett, Mary B. Barnett, Sarah B. Hon, Thomas B. Bender, Jr., Dina G. Bender. (Steele, William)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants David R. Barnett, Mary B. Barnett, Dina G. Bender, Thomas B. Bender, Jr, Charles O. Hon, IV, Sarah B. Hon, RAP, L.L.C.. (Bender, John)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by David R. Barnett, Mary B. Barnett, Dina G. Bender, Thomas B. Bender, Jr, Charles O. Hon, IV, Sarah B. Hon, RAP, L.L.C.. (Bender, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hancock Whitney Bank. All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service - RAP, LLC, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service - David Barnett, #3 Exhibit C - Proof of Service - Mary Barnett, #4 Exhibit D - Proof of Service - Charles Hon, #5 Exhibit E - Proof of Service - Sarah Hon, #6 Exhibit F - Proof of Service - Thomas Bender, #7 Exhibit G - Proof of Service - Dina Bender) (Heisterhagen, Timothy)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (jlr)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Steele, William)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Hancock Whitney Bank, Hancock Whitney Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Hancock Whitney Corporation for Hancock Whitney Bank.. (Heisterhagen, Timothy)
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to David R. Barnett, Mary B. Barnett, Dina G. Bender, Thomas B. Bender, Jr, Charles O. Hon, IV, Sarah B. Hon, RAP, L.L.C.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Service Order entered 5/4/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 6/15/2020.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 5/4/20. (cmj)
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2609264, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - November 15, 2013 Note, #2 Exhibit B - February 13, 2014 Change in Terms Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - September 12, 2016 Note, #4 Exhibit D - August 7, 2009 Guaranties, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons - Charles Hon, #7 Summons - Sarah Hon, #8 Summons - David Barnett, #9 Summons - Mary Barnett, #10 Summons - Thomas Bender, #11 Summons - Dina Bender, #12 Summons - RAP, LLC) (Heisterhagen, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock Whitney Bank v. RAP, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dina G. Bender
Represented By: John T. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAP, L.L.C.
Represented By: John T. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Barnett
Represented By: John T. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles O. Hon, IV
Represented By: John T. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary B. Barnett
Represented By: John T. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah B. Hon
Represented By: John T. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas B. Bender, Jr.
Represented By: John T. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hancock Whitney Bank
Represented By: Timothy Alan Heisterhagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?