McConico v. Cook et al
Case Number: 1:2020cv00314
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order GRANTING #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Magistrate Judge Order. Plaintiff shall complete the 1983 Complaint and Motion for IFP forms or pay filing fee no later than 7/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 07/16/2020. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff.
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension (14) Days Until the Alabama Department of Corrections Fountain Unit Provides A Copy of Plaintiff's PMOD Account as to #6 Order filed by James McConico, Jr. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (srd)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order, this action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for consideration & disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 06/15/2020. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff.
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order re: #1 1983 Complaint and #2 Motion for IFP filed by James McConico, Jr. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to complete and file this Court's forms for 1983 Complaint and Motion for IFP by 7/10/2020. Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff forms as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 06/11/2020. (srd) Copies to Plaintiff.
June 10, 2020 REFERRAL OF #5 Case Transferred In - District Transfer to Judge Nelson(PSU). (tot)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:20-cv-00302. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 10, 2020 Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama; Electronically transferred case via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk (am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/10/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER; it is ORDERED as follows: 1) The magistrate judge's #3 recommendation is adopted; 2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); DIRECTING the clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/10/2020.]
June 8, 2020 No objections filed to the #3 Recommendation. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/10/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama in accordance with the provisions of 28 USC 1404(a); Objections to R&R due by 5/29/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 5/14/2020. (bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/10/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by James McConico, Jr. (hrs, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/10/2020.]
May 5, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by James McConico, Jr. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-see docket entry #1 ). (hrs, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/10/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Mary Cook, Jefferson S. Dunn, Kay Ivey, filed by James McConico, Jr.(hrs, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McConico v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?