Hall v. Saul
Plaintiff: Beverly Hall
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00412
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of green card re: SS Complaint served 8/26/20 as to USAG (cmj)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of SS Complaint served 8/26/20 as to SSA (cmj)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA (re: green card). Andrew M. Saul/USA served on 8/24/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (cmj)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Oliver McDonald on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (McDonald, Oliver)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/20/20. (cmj)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul 70190140000038722015, U.S. Attorney 70191120000220687705 and U.S. Attorney General 70191120000220687699. (cmj)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing Clerk to serve. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/20/20. (cmj)
August 19, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Beverly Hall. (Thomas, Ashley)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( IFP.), filed by Beverly Hall. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 11/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons) (Thomas, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Hall
Represented By: Ashley Brooke Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Oliver McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?