Hall v. Cochran et al
Plaintiff: Iseral Bernard Hall
Defendant: Powe, Noah Trey Oliver Price, Sadie Stallworth and Sam Cochran
Case Number: 1:2021cv00150
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as set out. Plf shall REMIT to the Clerk, by 5/13/2021, a money order for $30.33. If the money order is not timely received, the Clerk is directed to forward this file for recommendation of dismissal as set out. If the money order is timely received, the Clerk is directed to forward this action for review as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/13/21. (copy mailed to Plf on 4/14/21) (tot)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order, REFERRING action to the Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/6/2021. (copy to Pltf) (mab)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Iseral Bernard Hall of Filing Statement re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; referred to Judge Nelson(PSU0 (mab)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Iseral Bernard Hall; Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson(PSU) (mab)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT [For Inmate Action] Under 42:1983 against Sam Cochran, Powe, Noah Trey Oliver Price, Sadie Stallworth, filed by Iseral Bernard Hall. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 6/28/2021; referred to Judge Nelson(PSU) (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Cochran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah Trey Oliver Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sadie Stallworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iseral Bernard Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?