Williams v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Alesia Williams
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2008cv00428
Filed: July 21, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Dallas
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/1/09. (tot)
March 16, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Plf's 21 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act be GRANTED, & that attny fees in the amount of $1,430.34 be awarded. Objections to R&R due by 3/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 3/16/09. (tot)
January 27, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that this action is REMANDED to the SSA pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. Sec. 405(g), for further proceedings consistent w/the opinion of this Court. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/27/09. (tot)
January 6, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the 17 Unopposed MOTION to Remand be GRANTED, & that this Court enter judgment reversing & remanding this cause to the Commissioner for action consistent w/the Dft's motion. Objections to R&R due by 1/21/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/6/09. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alesia Williams
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?