Carter v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Gordon G. Carter
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2008cv00526
Filed: September 16, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Dallas
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/9/09. (cmj)
May 22, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 19 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Gordon G. Carter, recommending that plaintiff receive attorney's fee in the amount of $2169.83 under EAJA. Objections to R&R due by 6/8/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/22/09. (cmj)
March 5, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 Unopposed MOTION to Remand Pursuant to Sentence Four filed by Michael J. Astrue, recommending that this case be reversed and remanded pursuant to sentence four. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/5/09. (cmj)
February 17, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 Unopposed MOTION to Remand Pursuant to Sentence Four filed by Michael J. Astrue, recommending that this case be reversed and remanded pursuant to sentence four. Oral argument is cancelled. Objections to R&R due by 3/3/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/17/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon G. Carter
Represented By: Marilyn H. Macey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?