Hamilton v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Ivy G. Hamilton
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2008cv00703
Filed: December 8, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Hale
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Butler
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Ivy G. Hamilton Objections to R&R due by 8/5/2009.. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 8/13/09. (adk)
July 22, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Ivy G. Hamilton Objections to R&R due by 8/5/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/22/09. (adk)
May 26, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT Remanding this action pursuant to sentence four of 42:405(g). Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 5/26/09. (adk)
April 21, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 MOTION to Remand filed by Ivy G. Hamilton, 11 Unopposed MOTION to Remand Pursuant to Sentence Four filed by Michael J. Astrue. Objections to R&R due by 5/5/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/20/09. (adk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivy G. Hamilton
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?