Clark v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Reginald Clark
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2009cv00088
Filed: February 20, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Dallas
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff's attorney's Motion for Attorney's Fees be GRANTED and that Plaintiff's attorney be AWARDED a fee in the amount of $13,318.13 for his services before this Court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Coplin pay Plaintiff $1,411.00, the sum representing the EAJA fee previously awarded. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 2/2/2011. (clr)
November 13, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff's Application for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act be and is hereby GRANTED and that Plaintiff be AWARDED an EAJA attorney's fee in the amount of $1,411.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 11/13/09. (clr)
August 13, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Reginald Clark against Defendant Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 8/13/09. (clr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Clark
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?