Thornton v. Astrue

Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Petitioner: Johnny Ray Thornton
Case Number: 2:2009cv00461
Filed: July 27, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Marengo
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in accordance with the memorandum opinion and order entered on this date. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/20/2012. (eec)
July 21, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in accordance with the memorandum opinion and order entered on this date. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/21/10. (eec)
April 19, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in accordance with the memorandum opinion and order entered on this date. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/19/10. (eec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornton v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnny Ray Thornton
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?