Dixon v. City of Selma et al

Plaintiff: Felicia Owens Dixon
Defendant: City of Selma, Jeffery Hardy, Beauty Benjamin, Ray Blanks, Willie Billingsley, Frederick Walker, Scott Swanson and Tanya Miles
Case Number: 2:2009cv00684
Filed: October 15, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 54 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND 53 DENYING MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Felicia Owens Dixon ref. Judge DuBose. (copy mailed to Appellant). (jal) (Motions terminated: 55 MOOTING 2ND MOTION for Leave to A ppeal in forma pauperis, 53 DENYING MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Felicia Owens Dixon, 54 ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/14/2011. (Mailed copy to Appellant, e-mailed USCA). (jal)
December 8, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment. It is recommended that defendants' motion for summary judgment be GRANTED and that judgment be entered in favor of each defendant and against the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/7/2010. (cmj)
November 12, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment. It is recommended that defendants' motion for summary judgment be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 12/2/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/12/10. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 16, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tanya Miles, recommending the motion to dismiss be granted and Ms. Miles be dismissed without prejudice.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/16/2010. (cmj)
February 24, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tanya Miles, recommending the motion to dismiss be granted and Ms. Miles be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 3/10/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/24/2010. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. City of Selma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Owens Dixon
Represented By: Norman Hurst, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Selma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beauty Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Blanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?