Vaughn v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Patricia Vaughn
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2012cv00279
Filed: April 20, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Marengo
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of this Court. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/15/2015. (mab)
January 30, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Plf's attny is AWARDED an EAJA fee in the amount of $1,241.88, payable to Plf. No costs are taxed. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/30/2013. (tot)
October 26, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the Commissioner's unopposed 17 motion to remand is hereby GRANTED, and JUDGMENT is entered reversing the Commissioner's decision. This cause is REMANDED to the Commissioner of Social Security for action consistent with the Commissioners motion. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/26/2012. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughn v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Vaughn
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?