Sewell v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Charles James Sewell
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2012cv00761
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Hale
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. In accordance with the Order entered this date, It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff's Darryl W. Hunt, and that he be awarded a fee of $17,575.75 for his services bef ore this Court. It is further ORDERED that Hunt pay Plaintiff the sum of $3,741.90, representing the fee previously awarded to Sewell pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 7/21/2015. (clr)
November 19, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 18 Motion for Attorney Fees. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff be AWARDED an EAJA attorney's fee in the amount of $3,741.90, payable to Plaintiff,Charles James Sewell, as further set out in the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 11/18/2013. (clr)
November 18, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. In accordance with the Order entered this date, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that JUDGMENT be entered in favor of Plaintiff Charles James Sewell and against Defendant Carolyn W. Colvin. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff be AWARDED an EAJA attorneys fee in the amount of $3,741.90. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 11/18/2013. (clr)
July 31, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff Charles James Sewell and against Defendant Carolyn W. Colvin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 7/31/2013. (clr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sewell v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles James Sewell
Represented By: Darryl W. Hunt
Represented By: Marilyn H. Macey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?