Miller v. Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Joe Miller
Defendant: Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell and State of Alaska, Division of Elections
Case Number: 3:2010cv00252
Filed: November 9, 2010
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: John W. Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2011 99 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Joe Miller (Tiemessen, John)
January 4, 2011 98 Letter received on 1/4/11 from Jerry McCutcheon. (JAE, COURTSTAFF)
January 3, 2011 97 Featured Case ORDER Denying Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief at Docket 95 . (Mailed to Mr. Lamb) (Jan, Chambers Staff)
December 30, 2010 96 DECLARATION of Thomas A. Lamb re 95 MOTION for Leave to File by Thomas A. Lamb. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 30, 2010 95 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae and Memorandum of Law by Thomas A. Lamb. (Attachments: # 1 Brief of Thomas A. Lamb, # 2 Exhibit A)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 30, 2010 94 NOTICE by Thomas A. Lamb (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 30, 2010 93 RE-NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Tiemessen on behalf of Joe Miller (Tiemessen, John) Modified on 12/30/2010 to amend dkt text (LSC, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2010 92 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Tiemessen on behalf of Joe Miller (Tiemessen, John)
December 29, 2010 91 JUDGMENT that plaintiff's complaint (as amended) is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 12/29/10. (LSC, COURT STAFF)
December 28, 2010 90 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections, filed by Joe Miller.(Van Flein, Thomas)
December 28, 2010 89 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Miller Affidavit by Joe Miller re 82 Memorandum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Van Flein, Thomas)
December 28, 2010 88 Featured Case ORDER Lifting Stay, Resolving Pending Motions, and Dismissing Case. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
December 28, 2010 87 NOTICE REGARDING BRIEFING OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections re 78 Order, (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
December 27, 2010 86 AFFIDAVIT of Gail Fenumiai re 85 MOTION to Expedite Order to lift the Preliminary Injunction, 84 Notice (Other) by Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
December 27, 2010 85 MOTION to Expedite Order to lift the Preliminary Injunction by Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
December 27, 2010 84 NOTICE of STATES OPPOSITION TO MILLERS MOTION by Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections re 79 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
December 27, 2010 83 Notice to Counsel re 82 Memorandum filed by Joe Miller. A review of the document submitted at dkt 82 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a COURTESY paper copy of the pleading has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 10.1(b) and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a COURTESY paper copy of your filing at dkt 82. The COURTESY paper copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf header on each page. (LSC, COURT STAFF)
December 27, 2010 82 MEMORANDUM for Partial Summary Judgment by Joe Miller 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joe Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Van Flein, Thomas)
December 27, 2010 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Joe Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Van Flein, Thomas)
December 27, 2010 80 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Joe Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Van Flein, Thomas)
December 27, 2010 79 NOTICE re Consent to Modification to Allow Certification by Joe Miller (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Van Flein, Thomas)
December 22, 2010 78 AMENDED TEXT ORDER: In the event Plaintiff wishes to pursue his remaining Federal claims, the Court modifies its prior filing deadlines, due to the Christmas holiday, as follows: Plaintiff shall have until Monday, December 27, 2010, at 9:00 AM to file his brief, and the Defendants may have until Wednesday, December 29, 2010, at 9:00 AM to file their brief, after which the matter will be taken under advisement. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
December 22, 2010 77 RRB TEXT ORDER: In the event Plaintiff appeals the Supreme Court's decision, the Court modifies its prior filing deadlines, due to the Christmas holiday, as follows: Plaintiff shall have until Monday, December 27, 2010, at 9:00 AM to file his brief, and the Defendants may have until Wednesday, December 29, 2010, at 9:00 AM to file their brief, after which the matter will be taken under advisement.(Jan, Chambers Staff) Modified on 12/22/2010 (JPS, CHAMBERS STAFF).
December 14, 2010 76 Notice to Counsel re 72 Notice (Other) filed by Joe Miller. A review of the document submitted at dkt 72 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a COURTESY paper copy of the pleading has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 10.1(b) and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a COURTESY paper copy of your filing at dkt 72. The COURTESY paper copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf header on each page. (LSC, COURT STAFF)
December 14, 2010 75 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PENDING MOTIONS. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
December 13, 2010 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re 67 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 48 First MOTION to Stay LIFT STAY-- On Shortened Time filed by Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
December 13, 2010 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re 67 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 48 First MOTION to Stay LIFT STAY-- On Shortened Time filed by Joe Miller. (Van Flein, Thomas)
December 13, 2010 72 NOTICE of State Court Filing by Joe Miller (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Van Flein, Thomas)
December 13, 2010 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re 57 MOTION to Intervene by Lisa Murkowski filed by Joe Miller. (Van Flein, Thomas)
December 13, 2010 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re 51 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Defendants' Motion To Re-Condition The Preliminary Injunction filed by Joe Miller. (Van Flein, Thomas)
December 13, 2010 69 RRB TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff may have until Tuesday, December 14, 2010, at 12:00 PM, to respond to Defendants' Amended Motion to Establish Expedited Briefing Schedule on Remaining Federal Issues at Docket 67 . (Jan, Chambers Staff)
December 13, 2010 68 RRB TEXT ORDER: Based on the Notice of Supplemental Facts at Docket 66 and assuming Plaintiff's participation in the Friday afternoon conference call referenced therein, the Court accepts as reasonable the deadlines for appeal set by the Alaska Supreme Court and hereby conditions the stay issued in this matter upon Plaintiff's compliance with those deadlines. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
December 13, 2010 67 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 48 First MOTION to Stay LIFT STAY-- On Shortened Time by Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections.(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
December 13, 2010 66 NOTICE of Supplemental Facts by Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell re 51 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Defendants' Motion To Re-Condition The Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Joanne Grace)(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
December 10, 2010 65 Featured Case ORDER granting 56 Motion to Expedite. Plaintiff shall file any response to the Motion for Order Granting Leave to Invervene 57 by 10:00 a.m. on December 13, 2010 and the Court will take matter under advisement at that time. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 12/10/10. (LSC, COURT STAFF)
December 10, 2010 64 JUDGE BEISTLINE TEXT ORDER: Based on plaintiff's filing at docket 61 , plaintiff may have until 12:00 Noon on Monday, December 13, 2010 to respond to defendant's Motion to Re-Condition at docket 51 . (LSC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 12/10/2010 to create relationship to document #51 (LSC, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2010 63 JUDGE BEISTLINE TEXT ORDER granting 50 Motion for Shortened Time on 51 Motion to Re-Condition the Preliminary Injunction. (LSC, COURT STAFF)
December 10, 2010 Docket Annotation re 60 Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s); The CM/ECF Help Desk was notified telephonically that the filing at docket 60 inadvertently did not contain the attached State Court document. The Notice was refiled at docket 62 . The filing at docket 60 should be disregarded.(NKD, COURT STAFF)
December 10, 2010 62 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Decision & Order on Motino for Summary Judgment & Cross Motions)(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
December 10, 2010 61 NOTICE Plaintiff Miller's Statement Regarding Briefing Schedule for State's Motion to Re-Condition Preliminary Injunction by Joe Miller re 52 Order on Motion to Expedite (Van Flein, Thomas)
December 10, 2010 60 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
December 10, 2010 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M. Kendall on behalf of Senator Lisa Murkowski (Kendall, Scott)
December 10, 2010 58 (PROPOSED) ANSWER to 40 Amended Complaint by Intervenor, CROSSCLAIM against Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections by Senator Lisa Murkowski.(McKeever, Timothy)
December 10, 2010 57 MOTION to Intervene by Senator Lisa Murkowski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(McKeever, Timothy)
December 10, 2010 56 MOTION to Expedite (Shortened Time) Motion for Order Granting Leave to Intervene by Senator Lisa Murkowski. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy McKeever, # 2 Proposed Order)(McKeever, Timothy)
December 10, 2010 55 JUDGE BEISTLINE TEXT ORDER re 51 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Defendants' Motion To Re-Condition The Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Alaska, Division of Elections. Plaintiff may have until 3:30 p.m., December 10, 2010 to respond to defendant's Motion to Re-Condition the Preliminary Injunction at docket 51 . (LSC, COURT STAFF)
December 10, 2010 54 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER granting 49 First MOTION to Expedite Motion to Lift Stay & Establish Schedule for Briefing Any Remaining Federal Issues filed by State of Alaska, Division of Elections, Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell. Plaintiff shall file his opposition memorandum to the state's First Motion to Stay LIFT STAY -- On Shortened Time, at dkt 48 , by 10:00 a.m. on Monday, December 13, 2010. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 12/10/10. (LSC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 12/10/2010 to correct docket text (LSC, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2010 53 JOINDER TO MOTION TO LIFT STAY by Prospective Intervenor, by Senator Lisa Murkowski 48 First MOTION to Stay LIFT STAY-- On Shortened Time filed by State of Alaska, Division of Elections, Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell. (McKeever, Timothy)
December 10, 2010 52 Featured Case ORDER granting 49 Motion to Expedite. Plaintiff shall file his opposition memorandum to the state's Motion to Lift the Stay by 10:00 a.m. on Monday, December 13, 2010. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 12/10/10. (LSC, COURT STAFF) Modified on to create relationship to document #48 12/10/2010 (LSC, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2010 51 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Defendants' Motion To Re-Condition The Preliminary Injunction by State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting The State's Motion to Re-Condition The Preliminary Injunction)(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
December 10, 2010 50 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Defendants' Motion for Shortened Time On The Motion To Re-Condition The Preliminary Injunction by State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting the State's Order for Shortened Time on Motion to Re-Condition The Preliminary Injunction)(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
December 10, 2010 49 First MOTION to Expedite Motion to Lift Stay & Establish Schedule for Briefing Any Remaining Federal Issues by Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
December 10, 2010 48 First MOTION to Stay LIFT STAY-- On Shortened Time by Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
November 22, 2010 47 NOTICE of Compliance with Court Order [Docket 39] by Joe Miller re 39 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion to Expedite (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Complaint))(Van Flein, Thomas)
November 22, 2010 46 RRB ORDER: The Court notes that several pleadings were filed in this matter subsequent to the Court's Stay of Proceedings filed at docket 39 . By way of clarification, these latter matters are stayed as well to be resolved in State Court. (NKD, COURT STAFF)
November 19, 2010 45 AFFIDAVIT of Jessica Talbert re 43 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Joe Miller. (Van Flein, Thomas)
November 19, 2010 44 AFFIDAVIT of Joseph Miller re 43 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Joe Miller. (Van Flein, Thomas)
November 19, 2010 43 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Joe Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Van Flein, Thomas)
November 19, 2010 42 AFFIDAVIT of Joseph Miller re 41 MOTION to Expedite Shortened Time re Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Joe Miller. (Van Flein, Thomas)
November 19, 2010 41 MOTION to Expedite Shortened Time re Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Joe Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Van Flein, Thomas)
November 19, 2010 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections, filed by Joe Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Van Flein, Thomas)
November 19, 2010 39 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Pending Motions and Staying Proceedings. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
November 18, 2010 38 RRB TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages at Docket 34 is GRANTED. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
November 18, 2010 37 AFFIDAVIT of Loren Leman re 35 Reply to Response to Motion by Joe Miller. (Van Flein, Thomas)
November 18, 2010 36 AFFIDAVIT of Joe Miller re 35 Reply to Response to Motion by Joe Miller. (Van Flein, Thomas)
November 18, 2010 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joe Miller. (Van Flein, Thomas)
November 18, 2010 34 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Joe Miller.(Van Flein, Thomas)
November 18, 2010 33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended by Joe Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Van Flein, Thomas)
November 16, 2010 32 TEXT ORDER finding as moot the Motion for Joinder at Docket 25 . (Jan, Chambers Staff)
November 16, 2010 31 RRB TEXT ORDER: The Motion to Intervene of the Alaska Federation of Natives at Docket 24 is hereby DENIED. The State of Alaska is responsible for and fully capable of representing the interests of all its citizens. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
November 16, 2010 30 RRB TEXT ORDER: The Motion Regarding Scheduling of Argument if Needed at Docket 27 is hereby DENIED. The Court has yet to determine if argument is necessary. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
November 15, 2010 29 Notice to Counsel re 26 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by State of Alaska, Division of Elections, Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell. A review of the document submitted at dkt 26 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a COURTESY paper copy of the pleading has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 10.1(b) and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a COURTESY paper copy of your filing at dkt 26. The COURTESY paper copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf header on each page. (CLW, COURT STAFF)
November 15, 2010 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re 27 First MOTION To hold argument on the plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction, if needed, on Friday, November 19 filed by Joe Miller. (Van Flein, Thomas)
November 15, 2010 27 First MOTION To hold argument on the plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction, if needed, on Friday, November 19 by Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
November 15, 2010 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on Shortened Time filed by Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Affidavit Gail Fenumiai)(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
November 15, 2010 25 MOTION for Joinder AFN's Joinder in the Division's Motion to Dismiss by Alaska Federation of Natives.(Amodio, Thomas)
November 15, 2010 24 MOTION to Intervene of the Alaska Federation of Natives and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Alaska Federation of Natives.(Amodio, Thomas)
November 15, 2010 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on Shortened Time Alaska Federation of Natives' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Joinder in the Opposition of Division of Elections filed by Alaska Federation of Natives. (Amodio, Thomas)
November 15, 2010 Docket Annotation: Error re 22 Notice of Appearance; document should be divided and filed as separate documents; Correction: Attorney to re-file the portion "Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Joinder in the Opposition of Division of Elections", "Motion to Intervene of the Alaska Federation of Natives and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof" and "AFN's Joinder to the Division's Motion to Dismiss".(CLW, COURT STAFF)
November 15, 2010 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Amodio on behalf of Alaska Federation of Natives (Amodio, Thomas) Modified on 11/15/2010 see docket annotation dated 11/15/10 (CLW, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2010 21 RRB TEXT ORDER: As the Court ordered at Docket 16 , the significant jurisdictional issued raised is to be addressed in the briefing schedule set forth at Docket 16 . (Jan, Chambers Staff)
November 11, 2010 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Expedite ON MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Joe Miller. (Van Flein, Thomas)
November 10, 2010 19 AFFIDAVIT of Margaret Paton-Walsh re 18 MOTION to Expedite ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
November 10, 2010 18 MOTION to Expedite ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
November 10, 2010 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (On Shortened Time) by Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
November 10, 2010 16 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
November 10, 2010 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Partial Opposition) filed by Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Paton-Walsh, Margaret) Modified on 11/10/2010 to Create relationship to document #13, Remove relationship to document #5, correct docket text and regenerate NEF (LSC, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2010 14 AFFIDAVIT of Thomas V. Van Flein re 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on Shortened Time by Joe Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Van Flein, Thomas)
November 10, 2010 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on Shortened Time by Joe Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Van Flein, Thomas)
November 10, 2010 12 CLERK'S NOTICE: This case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Ralph R. Beistline for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:10-cv-00252-RRB. (NKD, COURT STAFF)
November 10, 2010 11 JWS ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Clerk of Court will please reassign this case to another Judge. (NKD, COURT STAFF) (NKD, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/10/2010 to add pdf and regenerate NEF (NKD, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2010 10 RRB TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief at Docket 5 is GRANTED. Plaintiff may now file and serve the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
November 10, 2010 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret A. Paton-Walsh on behalf of Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
November 10, 2010 Docket Annotation: ERROR re Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Supporting Document, Motion for Shortened Time and Supporting Documents, clerk's dockets 3 , 4 , 6 and 7 were inadvertently docketed as stand alone document entries rather than being docketed as attachments to the Motion to Accept Overlength Brief as required by Section 17 of the Electronic Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures. CORRECTION: The pdfs at dockets 3, 4, 6 and 7 have been removed and added as attachments to the Motion to Accept Overlength Brief. If the Motion to Accept Overlength is granted counsel will need to refile all of the documents.(NKD, COURT STAFF)
November 9, 2010 Summons Issued as to Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell and State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (NXL, COURT STAFF)
November 9, 2010 8 Unissued summons re Defendant Lt. Governor C. Campbell. (Attachments: # 1 Unissued Summons re Defendant SOA-Division of Elections)(NXL, COURT STAFF)
November 9, 2010 7 AFFIDAVIT of Thomas V. Van Flein re 6 MOTION on Shortened Time by Joe Miller. (NXL, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/10/2010 to indicate error: See 11/10/10 docket annotation (NKD, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2010 6 MOTION on Shortened Time re 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Joe Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(NXL, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/10/2010 to indicate error: see 11/10/10 docket annotation (NKD, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2010 5 MOTION to Accept Overlength Brief. by Joe Miller.(NXL, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2010: # 1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Exhibit Ex A to Motion for Prelim Injunction, # 3 Ex B to Motion for Prelim Injunction, # 4 Propose Order re Motion for Prelim Injunction, # 5 Affidavit in support of Motion for Prelim Injunction, # 6 Ex 1 to Aff, # 7 Ex 2 to Aff, # 8 Ex 3 to Aff, # 9 Ex 4 to Aff, # 10 Motion for Shortened Time, # 11 Proposed Order re Motion for Shortened Time, # 12 Affidavit in support of motion for shortened time) (NKD, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2010 4 AFFIDAVIT of Thomas V. Van Flein re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Joe Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(NXL, COURT STAFF)
November 9, 2010 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Joe Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(NXL, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/10/2010 to indicate error: See 11/10/10 docket annotation (NKD, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2010 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (NXL, COURT STAFF)
November 9, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell, State of Alaska, Division of Elections (Filing fee $ 350. Receipt #ANC002851), filed by Joe Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(NXL, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Miller
Represented By: Thomas V. Van Flein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Governor Craig Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska, Division of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?