Furie Operating Alaska, LLC v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al

Plaintiff: Furie Operating Alaska, LLC
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Janet Napolitano, U.S. Customs and Border Protection and David V. Aguilar
Case Number: 3:2012cv00158
Filed: August 6, 2012
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: John W. Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2015 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 116 Motion to Dismis; Cts II, III and IV are dism. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/6/15. (PRR, COURT STAFF)
December 23, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 97 Motion to Compel; defs to file amended certified admin record w/i 42 days of this ord; brfing sched at dkt 96 is vacated; w/i 14 days of filing expanded certified record, gov to file mot to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 12/23/14. (PRR, COURT STAFF)
July 1, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and OPINION denying 75 Motion for Certification. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/1/14. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
March 27, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 3/27/14. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
April 15, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 4/15/13. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Furie Operating Alaska, LLC v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Furie Operating Alaska, LLC
Represented By: Adolf V. Zeman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David V. Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?