Tyler v. State of Alaska et al

Plaintiff: Jaime Tyler
Defendant: Omar Sutherland, James Travline, State of Alaska and Alaska State Employees Association (ASEA) Local 52, AFL-CIO
Case Number: 3:2019cv00039
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint ASEA's Answer to Amended Complaint With Jury Demand by Alaska State Employees Association (ASEA) Local 52, AFL-CIO.(Brown, Molly)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly C. Brown on behalf of Alaska State Employees Association (ASEA) Local 52, AFL-CIO (Brown, Molly)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 JWS TEXT ORDER denying #5 Motion for Leave to File. The motion at docket 5 to file an amended complaint is denied without prejudice to a renewed motion that complies with the applicable Local Civil Rules. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by State of Alaska.(McIntyre, Siobhan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Siobhan McIntyre on behalf of State of Alaska (McIntyre, Siobhan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER of James Travline to #1 Complaint by James Travline.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Jaime Tyler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Sara)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 2/20/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to Alaska State Employees Association (ASEA) Local 52, AFL-CIO, State of Alaska Attorney General, State of Alaska Chief Attorney General, Omar Sutherland, James Travline. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant State of Alaska Attorney General, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant State of Alaska Chief Attorney General, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant James Travline, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Alaska State Employees Association (ASEA) Local 52, AFL-CIO, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant Omar Sutherland)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Bloom, Sara)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2648128.), filed by Jaime Tyler.(Bloom, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyler v. State of Alaska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Tyler
Represented By: Sara Lynne Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Travline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska
Represented By: Siobhan McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska State Employees Association (ASEA) Local 52, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Molly C. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?