Ospina et al v. Wertanen et al
Plaintiff: Fernando Ospina and Traci Reedy
Defendant: Department of Public Safety, Matthew J. Wertanen and State of Alaska
Case Number: 3:2019cv00224
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Barber, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Department of Public Safety, State of Alaska (Attachments: #1 Entry of Appearance, #2 Answer to Amended Complaint)(Leeah, Jessica)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Department of Public Safety, State of Alaska, Matthew J. Wertanen (Pace, Andalyn)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Department of Public Safety, State of Alaska, Matthew J. Wertanen (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(Pace, Andalyn)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Chadwick P. McGrady (McGrady, Chadwick)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 8/27/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Pace, Andalyn)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Kenai Superior Court, case number 3KN-18-01084CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2745016) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pace, Andalyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ospina et al v. Wertanen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Jessica Leeah
Represented By: Andalyn Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J. Wertanen
Represented By: Andalyn Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska
Represented By: Jessica Leeah
Represented By: Andalyn Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Ospina
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Barber
Represented By: Chadwick P. McGrady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Reedy
Represented By: Chadwick P. McGrady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?