Rancourt et al v. Bolger et al
Plaintiff: Loren Rancourt and S. R.
Defendant: Joel Bolger, Michael Shaffer, Cameron Compton, Pamela Washington, Gregory Miller, Child Support Enforcement Division, Heather Fuentes, Leslie Dickson, Michael Corey, Patrick Hanley, Alaska Bar Association, State of Alaska, Municipality of Anchorage and Ryan Montgomery
Case Number: 3:2021cv00189
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. An amended complaint is due 10/18/2021. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 9/7/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #5 Order by Loren Rancourt.(PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 8/24/2021 to correct date filed (PXS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge to Statues by Loren Rancourt (PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; granted in part 3 Motion to Seal. Dkts 1 and 3 are SEALED. Minor child's name shall not be included on any future filings. Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. First Amended Complaint or Notice of Dismissal due by 9/17/2021. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 8/16/21. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Alaska Department of Law Attorney Generals Office, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Ryan Montgomery, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Municipality of Anchorage, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Patrick Hanley, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant Michael Corey, #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant Leslie Dickson, #6 Unissued Summons re Defendant Heather Fuentez, #7 Unissued Summons re Defendant Child Support Enforcement Division, #8 Unissued Summons re Defendant Gregory Miller, #9 Unissued Summons re Defendant Pamela Washington, #10 Unissued Summons re Defendant Cameron Compton, #11 Unissued Summons re Defendant Michael Shaffer, #12 Unissued Summons re Defendant Joel Bolger, #13 Unissued Summons re Defendant Alaska Bar Association)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 12, 2021 Summons Issued as to Alaska Bar Association, Joel Bolger, Child Support Enforcement Division, Cameron Compton, Michael Corey, Leslie Dickson, Heather Fuentes, Patrick Hanley, Gregory Miller, Ryan Montgomery, Municipality of Anchorage, Michael Shaffer, State of Alaska, Pamela Washington. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 8/11/2021 to reflect date filed (PXS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rancourt et al v. Bolger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren Rancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Bolger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Child Support Enforcement Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of Anchorage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?