Gordon v. Potter et al
Plaintiff: John Gordon
Defendant: Corey Potter and F/V Gambler
Case Number: 3:2023cv00010
Filed: January 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688 Jones Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery closes 8/31/2023. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 2/8/23. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 7, 2023 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE re #16 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John W. Merriam, at docket #16 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 7, 2023 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Merriam, John)
February 7, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney John W. Merriam. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3387108.) by John Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Merriam, John)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 1/23/2023. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
January 18, 2023 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:22-cv-01375. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Parties' #12 Stipulated MOTION. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the District of Alaska for resolution. This case is now CLOSED. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/18/2023.]
January 6, 2023 Filing 12 Joint Stipulated MOTION , filed by Plaintiff John Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/6/2023, (Merriam, John) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/18/2023.]
January 3, 2023 NOTICE of Re-Setting Deadline re Parties' #11 Stipulated MOTION. Pursuant to section II(G) of Judge Lin's Standing Order, the Parties' Joint Status Report deadline is now 2/10/2023. (LH) (cc: Attorney Barcott via ECF ad hoc) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/18/2023.]
January 3, 2023 NOTE: Document #11 was filed improperly. The appearance of attorney Michael Barcott is not proper, and further notices of electronic filing will not be sent to Mr. Barcott until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (LH) (cc: Attorney Barcott via ECF ad hoc) Modified to strike entry on 1/4/2023 due to error. (LH). [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/18/2023.]
December 31, 2022 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION , filed by Plaintiff John Gordon. Noting Date 1/3/2023, (Merriam, John) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/18/2023.]
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Tana Lin. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/12/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/27/2022, Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2023. (KMP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/18/2023.]
November 14, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at http://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures. All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/18/2023.]
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/18/2023.]
November 10, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Tana Lin for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. (AQ) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/18/2023.]
November 8, 2022 Attorney Daniel Patrick Barcott added for Corey Potter; per #5 Notice of Appearance. (LH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/18/2023.]
November 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/15/2022. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/18/2023.]
November 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael A Barcott on behalf of Defendant Corey Potter. (Barcott, Michael) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/18/2023.]
September 30, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-00758-DGE, by Plaintiff John Gordon. (Merriam, John) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/18/2023.]
September 29, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Corey Potter. (RE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/18/2023.]
September 29, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Notice of Related Cases Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 10/4/2022. (RE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/18/2023.]
September 29, 2022 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (RE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/18/2023.]
September 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Praecipe)(Merriam, John) (Prepayment Waived) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/18/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Potter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gordon
Represented By: John W. Merriam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Potter
Represented By: Michael A. Barcott
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Barcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V Gambler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?