Rooke v. Vail et al

Plaintiff: Sean Thomas Rooke
Defendant: Eldon Vail, A Kenney, Bruno Stolc, C Kossman, C Coleman and Unknown Party
Case Number: 2:2011cv00955
Filed: May 13, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's letter filed on 11/3/11 is construed as a motion for an extension of time to file a second amended complaint and is granted 17 . Plaintiff is granted an additional 45 days from the filing date of this Order to file a second amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a strike under 28:1915(g). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/7/11. (TLJ)
October 4, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the First Amended Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim 15 . Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dis missal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a strike under 28:1915(g). The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/4/11. (TLJ)
August 11, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Sean Rooke. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/10/11. (TLJ)
June 13, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's Washington State application to proceed in forma pauperis 1 is denied. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certifed six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/13/11. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rooke v. Vail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldon Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruno Stolc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Kossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Thomas Rooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?