Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Suazo et al
Plaintiff: Sierra Club, WildEarth Guardians and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: David Bernhardt, Raymond Suazo and United States Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 3:2019cv08204
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #18 Service Executed filed by Center for Biological Diversity, WildEarth Guardians, Sierra Club. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, WildEarth Guardians: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons upon Defendant Federal Agency and Officials on 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Potter, Elizabeth)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on October 14, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(LMR)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P. Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-8204-PCT-SPL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 17, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Sarah Stellberg on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to David Bernhardt, Raymond Suazo, United States Bureau of Land Management. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Submitted by Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, WildEarth Guardians. (Potter, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Submitted by Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, WildEarth Guardians. (Potter, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, WildEarth Guardians. (Potter, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Elizabeth Potter on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Center for Biological Diversity, WildEarth Guardians, Sierra Club. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #5 Summons Submitted filed by Center for Biological Diversity, WildEarth Guardians, Sierra Club. Unable to issue summonses. Summons must list attorney information on form where indicated. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17160223. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8204-PCT-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MFR)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, WildEarth Guardians. (Potter, Elizabeth) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MFR)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WildEarth Guardians. (Potter, Elizabeth) (MFR)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sierra Club. (Potter, Elizabeth) (MFR)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity. (Potter, Elizabeth) (MFR)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17160223 filed by Center for Biological Diversity, WildEarth Guardians, Sierra Club. (Potter, Elizabeth) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Suazo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Suazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Sarah Stellberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Hunter Potter
Represented By: Adriane J Hofmeyr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Sarah Stellberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Hunter Potter
Represented By: Adriane J Hofmeyr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Sarah Stellberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Hunter Potter
Represented By: Adriane J Hofmeyr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?