Burress, et al v. Union Pacific, et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Wade Burress and Priscilla Burress
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Missouri & Northern Arkansas Railroad Company Inc
Thirdparty_defendant: ConAgra Poultry Company
Cross_claimant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Cross_defendant: ConAgra Poultry Company
Case Number: 1:2001cv00072
Filed: July 7, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2009 471 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/7/09. (bkp)
May 27, 2009 462 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 417 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 419 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 420 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 421 Motion in Limine; denying 422 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 428 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 428 Motion to Exclude; granting 433 Motion in Limine; granting 440 Motion in Limine; denying 450 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/27/09. (bkp)
May 26, 2009 448 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER directing that responses to motions in limine be filed by 11:00 a.m., Thursday, May 28, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/26/09. (bkp)
May 11, 2009 411 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER directing the parties to submit jury instructions by noon, Thursday, May 28, 2009, and setting a telephone conference re: instructions at 2:00 p.m. that afternoon. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/11/09. (bkp)
May 7, 2009 408 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 397 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/7/09. (mkf)
April 3, 2009 395 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 385 Motion in Limine to Admit Expert Attorney Testimony and Witness Deposition Testimony. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/3/09. (mkf)
March 25, 2009 390 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 380 Motion for Reconsideration, denying 383 MOTION in Limine to Prohibit Expert Testimony of Robert Pottroff and denying 381 MOTION to Substitute Party in Interest. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/25/09. (bkp)
March 16, 2009 378 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re trial. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/16/09. (bkp)
March 2, 2009 375 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 374 Letter from Robert Henry; parties are directed to submit short letter-briefs by 4:00 p.m., by this Friday (March 6, 2009). Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/2/09. (bkp)
February 6, 2009 372 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ruling that at trial the Railroads have the burden of establishing there was potential liability toward Plaintiffs, and that the settlement agreement was reasonable and made in good faith; this case remains set for a jury trial commencing at 9: 00 a.m., Tuesday, June 9, 2009; discovery cutoff is 5 p.m., Wednesday, March 25, 2009, and any dispositive motions must be filed by 5 p.m., Thursday, April 9, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/6/09. (mkf) Modified on 2/6/2009 to correct typographical error(mkf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burress, et al v. Union Pacific, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wade Burress
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Burress
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Missouri & Northern Arkansas Railroad Company Inc
Represented By: Richard A. Davidson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: ConAgra Poultry Company
Represented By: John S. Cherry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: ConAgra Poultry Company
Represented By: Aaron A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?