Haynes v. McQuilliams, et al

Case Number: 1:2004cv00034
Filed: April 8, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2009 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 170 Motion for Leave to Appeal; denying 170 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/25/09. (bkp)
January 15, 2009 167 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER correcting the amount owed to counsel and directing the Clerk of the Court to disburse from the Library Fund the amount of $1,096.09 and distribute it to the named applicant and to maintain a copy of this Order, together with the application, in the Library Fund file 165 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/15/09. (bkp).
January 6, 2009 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 164 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Walter Haynes and ordering the Clerk of the Court to disburse money from the Library Fund in the amount of $1,074.28 and distribute to the named applicant, and directing that this Order, along with the application, be placed in the Library Fund file maintained by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/6/08. (bkp)
November 18, 2008 162 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Richard Munson against Walter Haynes re 159 Jury Verdict. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/18/08. (bkp)
November 12, 2008 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the name of deft Munson to his correct name, Richard Munson. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/12/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. McQuilliams, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?