Johnson v. Rockwell Automation Inc

Case Number: 1:2006cv00017
Filed: April 11, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
Presiding Judge: George Howard
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2009 225 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER regarding Motions in Limine: motions 188 [190 192 201 are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; motions 181 203 are DENIED; and motions 197 205 are GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/17/09. (vjt)
June 16, 2009 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing persons from the McMath Woods Law Firm to bring electronic devices into the courthouse in Batesville, Arkansas, between June 22, 2009 and July 3, 2009, subject to rules stated in the Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/16/09. (mkf)
April 24, 2009 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 162 Motion in Limine to allow the video deposition of Julia Allen, M.D. at the trial of this matter. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/24/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Rockwell Automation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?