Kendrick et al v. Faust et al

Plaintiff: Theresa Catherynne Pryor-Kendrick and Kathleen M Dechant
Defendant: Nurzuhal Faust, Linda F Dixon, Sonya Whitefield McGinnis-Douglas, Leslie H Zomant, Linda Dykes-Cullum, Maggie Capel, John A Maples, Jr, Jim Smith, Patricia A Roberts, Candice Ashby, Lavonda K Donavion, Lori Tacker, Judith Steed, Caraway, Jeffry T Deen, Julia Webber, Cherry Garrett, Stephanie England, Julie Redd and Kathy Pirano
Case Number: 1:2007cv00025
Filed: May 18, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2013 490 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 486 Jury Verdict. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/1/13. (kpr)
February 23, 2011 450 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 447 Motion for Bill of Costs and directing the Clerk of the Court to disburse money from the Library Fund in the amount of $1,619.79 and distribute to the named applicant. A copy of this Order, together with the application, shall be maintained in the Library Fund file by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/23/11. (kpr)
February 1, 2011 446 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 445 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/1/11. (bkp)
February 24, 2010 404 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 388 389 MOTIONS to Dismiss filed by Catherynne W Kendrick: Pursuant to plaintiff's failure to withdraw these motions to dismiss, her claims against defts Zomant, Dixon and Capel are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/24/10. (bkp)
January 6, 2010 396 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 380 Partial Report and Recommendations granting in part and denying in part 338 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/6/10. (bkp)
November 30, 2009 378 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 351 Motion to Dismiss; denying 371 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/30/09. (bkp)
November 12, 2009 362 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER notifying plaintiff of her opportunity to withdraw her motion to dismiss if she chooses within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/12/09. (bkp)
July 8, 2009 343 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 334 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 331 Motion for Relief filed by Catherynne W Kendrick. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/8/09. (bkp)
May 20, 2009 326 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 323 Motion to Dismiss Claims against defts Norris, May, Gibson, Jones, Cargill, Payne and Faust with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/20/09. (bkp)
March 4, 2009 314 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 313 Motion to Dismiss Parties Capt. Jeffrey Deen, Sgt. Mickey Robertson and Lt. Deborah Masters without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/4/09. (bkp)
December 29, 2008 294 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 280 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION and denying 275 Motion for Relief filed by Catherynne W Kendrick. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/29/08. (bkp)
December 10, 2008 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 273 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 272 Motion to Add Defendants filed by Catherynne W Kendrick. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/10/08. (bkp) (Docket entry modified on 12/11/2008 to correct the linkage.) (thd)
November 4, 2008 266 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 238 Motion for Reconsideration re 31 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/4/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kendrick et al v. Faust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Catherynne Pryor-Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen M Dechant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurzuhal Faust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda F Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Whitefield McGinnis-Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie H Zomant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Dykes-Cullum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Capel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A Maples, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candice Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavonda K Donavion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Tacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caraway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffry T Deen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Pirano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?