Hughes v. Banks et al

Plaintiff: Brian R Hughes
Defendant: James Banks, Darryl Golden, Curtis Meizner, Ronald Gillihan, Eddie Selvey, David Beaty, Marvin Baird, William Truax, Stanley Robinson, Diane Peppers, Chester Pool, Patrick Miller, Ronald Klein, Edward Yarnell, C E Johnson, Sam Guiltner, Steven Gill, Larry Norris, Ray Hobbs and Larry May
Case Number: 1:2007cv00027
Filed: June 6, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Izard
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2014 305 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds from the Library Fund in the amount of $6,220.45 to the named applicant. A copy of this Order, together with the application, shall be placed in the Library Fund file maintained by the Clerk's Office. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/6/14. (kpr)
April 29, 2013 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 243 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 209 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/29/13. (vjt)
August 9, 2012 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER because pltf is represented by counsel, the Clerk is directed to forward pltf's correspondence to his attorney, without filing it. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 8/9/12. (vjt)
August 7, 2012 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to immediately forward a copy of this file to counsel for pltf. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 8/7/12. (vjt)
July 26, 2012 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 220 MOTION of Daniel G. Ritchey to Withdraw as appointed counsel for pltf; appointing Gregory T. Jones as counsel of record for pltf; the Clerk is directed to send counsel a copy of this Order and Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/26/12. (vjt)
July 12, 2012 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Daniel G. Ritchey as counsel of record for pltf in place of Frances Morris Finley; the Clerk is directed to send counsel a copy of this Order and Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/12/12. (vjt)
May 25, 2012 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 201 MOTION to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions; Motions due by 6/25/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/25/12. (vjt)
September 1, 2011 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 184 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to file Objections to Proposed Findings and Recommendations; Objections to R&R due 9/12/11. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/1/11. (vjt)
March 19, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/19/09. (bkp)
January 8, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to Eighth Circuit remand re 10 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Brian Hughes; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the Defendants with a copy of the complaint (DE#2), amended complaint (DE#28), this Order, and summons, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 1/8/09. (mkf)
June 12, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf's complt be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted 2. This dismissal count as a "strike" for purposes of 28 USC 1915(g). The Court certify that an ifp appeal taken from the order dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 6/28/2007. Signed by Judge H. David Young on 6/12/2007. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Banks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian R Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meizner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Gillihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Selvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Beaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Truax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Peppers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester Pool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Yarnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C E Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Guiltner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?