Eaton v. Dunavion

Plaintiff: Detina Eaton
Defendant: Dunavion
Case Number: 1:2008cv00032
Filed: June 9, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 41 Recommended Disposition in its entirety; therefore, deft's 36 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and pltf's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/21/09. (vjt)
October 6, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that deft's motion for summary judgment be granted and pltf's complt be dismissed without prejudice 36 . The Court certify that an ifp appeal from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Objections to R&R due. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 10/6/2009. (lej)
March 20, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 25 Witness List (purs. to FRCvP 26(a)(3)(A)(ii)) filed by Detina Eaton: Plaintiff will be allowed to have only Amanda Dutton, Belinda McBay and Boyd Martin as witnesses; directing the ADC to ensure plaintiff's attendance at the trial, as well as plaintiff's institutional and medical jackets; and to further ensure the attendance of the three allowed witnesses. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/20/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eaton v. Dunavion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detina Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunavion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?