Ballard v. Highmark Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Patrick Ballard
Defendant: Highmark Life Insurance Company, Aetna Life Insurance Company and Broadspire Services Inc
Case Number: 1:2008cv00045
Filed: August 26, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Independence
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1446 Petition for Removal-ERISA

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record and directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/15/2011. (dmn)
May 26, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/26/10. (bkp)
October 29, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion to Stay pending exhaustion of administrative remedies and vacating the ERISA scheduling order entered September 10, 2008. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/29/08. (bkp)
September 17, 2008 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 2 Complaint. Defendants' Answer deadline extended through 10/1/08. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/17/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballard v. Highmark Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Ballard
Represented By: Jerrie Lee Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highmark Life Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. B. Gerth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. B. Gerth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadspire Services Inc
Represented By: John E. B. Gerth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?