Fireman's Fund Insurance Company et al v. Care Management Inc et al

Plaintiff: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company and Medical Liability Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Care Management Inc, Southwest Nursing Homes Inc and Health Care Organization Inc
Case Number: 1:2008cv00056
Filed: October 29, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 40 Opinion and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, and Medical Liability Mutual Insurance Company. It is hereby declared that Fireman's Fund Ins Co and Med ical Liability Mutual Ins Co provide no coverage under policy No. HPC2938333 to Care Management Inc, Southwest Nursing Homes Inc, and Health Care Organization Inc, for the claims of Carol Henson, individually and as Special Administratrix of the Estate of Mamie S. Denton, Deceased, and the wrongful death beneficiaries of Mamie S. Denton. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/6/10. (vjt)
March 24, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION ARKANSAS SUPREME COURT re 20 Certification of Issue to State Court, 25 Per Curiam Order. CERTIFIED QUESTION ANSWERED. Opinion Delivered March 4, 2010 by Ronald L. Sheffield, Associate Justice. (vjt)
June 15, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATION ORDER, purs to Rule 6-8 of the Rules of the Supreme Court of the State of Arkansas, this Court certifies to the Supreme Court of Arkansas a question of law that may be determinative of this case. The Clerk is hereby directed to forward this Order to the Supreme Court of Arkansas under his official seal. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/15/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company et al v. Care Management Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: Brooks Christopher White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medical Liability Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brooks Christopher White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Nursing Homes Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Organization Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?