McIllwain v. Weaver et al

Plaintiff: Angela McIllwain
Defendant: Dale Weaver, Sharp County, Arkansas, Gerald Traw, Tamara Roberts, Ash Flat Arkansas, City of, Bobby Woods and John Does
Case Number: 1:2008cv00057
Filed: November 3, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 84 Motion to Dismiss; this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice upon settlement. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/29/10. (vjt)
June 3, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 80 MOTION in Limine filed by defts. and directing counsel to respond by fax or email by 5 p.m., Thursday, June 10, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/3/10. (bkp)
February 22, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/22/10. (bkp)
January 20, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to counsel re instrument of crime directing counsel to advise the Court on this matter by 5:00 p.m., Monday, January 25, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/20/10. (bkp)
September 23, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion for Reconsideration re 21 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/23/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIllwain v. Weaver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela McIllwain
Represented By: Raymond T. Starken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Traw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ash Flat Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?