Robinson v. Holderbee et al

Plaintiff: Antonio C Robinson
Defendant: Virgil Holderbee and Tony Younger
Case Number: 1:2008cv00066
Filed: December 9, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Independence
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 47 Memorandum Order ; case is DISMISSED without prejudice, for failure to prosecute; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/29/09. (mkf)
June 16, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 32 and granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Rhonda Dowell, Sheppard. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/16/09. (bkp)
May 29, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defts be granted in part and denied in part. Objections to R&R due by 6/12/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 5/29/09. (bkp)
May 11, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file a response to defts' 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment within ten days of the date of this Order; and directing defts to provide the last-known address for deft Tony Younger, within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 5/11/09. (bkp)
January 28, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing deft Virgil Holderbee from plaintiff's complaint, for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/28/09. (bkp)
January 13, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 5 Amended Complaint filed by Antonio C Robinson and directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve defts Tony Younger, Sgt. Sheppard and Rhonda Dowell with a copy of the original and amended complaints without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/13/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Holderbee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio C Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgil Holderbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Younger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?