Platz et al v. Carter et al

Case Number: 1:2009cv00014
Filed: March 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice due to settlement. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/28/10. (bkp)
May 27, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Motion to Compel and directing pltf. Platz to provide all information requested by defts Carter and Beelman. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/27/10. (bkp)
May 7, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Motion for Medical Examination. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/7/10. (bkp)
April 16, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defendants to produce Bremer's notes taken at the accident scene 47 . Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/16/10. (bkp)
April 7, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion to Compel and granting defts Beelman and Carter up to and including April 12, 2010 to comply with this order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/7/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Platz et al v. Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?