Robertson et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al

Plaintiff: William C Robertson and Carey W Robertson
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company and XTO Energy Inc
Case Number: 1:2009cv00020
Filed: May 1, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 42 Opinion and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Union Pacific Railroad Company and XTO Energy Inc, dismissing the complaint of Carey W Robertson and William C Robertson with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/24/10. (vjt)
July 8, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Joint Motion to Stay all proceedings in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/8/10. (vjt)
July 7, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING pltfs' 28 Motion to Stay Motion for Reconsideration; deferring ruling on 26 Motion for Reconsideration until the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit issues a ruling on the petition for rehearing in Griffis v. Anadarko E & P Company, LP; parties are directed to notify the Court when the Eighth Circuit rules on the petition for rehearing. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/7/10. (vjt)
November 16, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that 6 Defts' Motion for Summary Judgment and 15 Pltfs' Motion for Summary Judgment are hereby DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/16/09. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C Robertson
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey W Robertson
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Joseph Patrick McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTO Energy Inc
Represented By: Robert M. Honea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?