FutureFuel Chemical Company v. National Biodiesel Board

Plaintiff: FutureFuel Chemical Company
Defendant: National Biodiesel Board
Case Number: 1:2009cv00023
Filed: May 13, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Independence
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2012 132 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Pursuant to settlement, this case is dismissed with prejudice. The undersigned retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement and mutual release. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/7/2013. (hph)
May 3, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion for Reconsideration of the 46 Order denying Motion to Compel; and ordering deft National Biodiesel Board to fully respond to the interrogs and requests for production of docs specified in the motion to compel within 30 days. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/3/11. (kpr)
January 24, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/24/11. (bkp)
January 8, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/8/10. (bkp)
July 22, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR by Clerk's office (wrong case)(bkp)- DISREGARD. (The docket text was modified on 7/22/2009 to indicate the document was filed in error - the case will be reopened) (mkf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FutureFuel Chemical Company v. National Biodiesel Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FutureFuel Chemical Company
Represented By: Gary B. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Biodiesel Board
Represented By: John Jarrod Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?