Alcorn v. Collectors Training Institute of Illinois Inc et al

Plaintiff: Barbara Alcorn
Defendant: Collectors Training Institute of Illinois Inc, Creditors Interchange Receivable Management LLC, Resurgent Capital Services LP, GE Capital Bank and LVNV Funding LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00024
Filed: May 18, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice by reason of settlement. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/10/09. (bkp)
July 24, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Party Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. and Answer To Complaint of Defendants: Plaintiff is directed to respond to the motion by noon on Wednesday, July 29, 2009, if it disagrees with deft's position. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/24/09. (bkp)
June 29, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the name of separate deft GE Capital Bank to GE Money Bank.Signed DOC by Judge Mary A. Johnson on 6/29/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcorn v. Collectors Training Institute of Illinois Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Alcorn
Represented By: Matthew M. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collectors Training Institute of Illinois Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creditors Interchange Receivable Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Capital Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?